Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0757289
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
11.05.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] |
13.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
26.05.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
18.04.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.06.1998 |
First examination report |
|
18.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.08.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] |
19.12.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] |
03.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
03.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|