Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0757289 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2000 | B1 | EP0757289 | 05.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96202099 | 24.07.1996 | EP95202134 | 04.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5763137 | 09.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95202134 | 04.08.1995 | US479995 | 25.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2833741B | Global Dossier | 09.12.1998 | B2 | JPH0950128 | 18.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95202134 | 04.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69609258T | 22.02.2001 | T2 | DE69609258D1 | 17.08.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP95202134 | 04.08.1995 |