EP0822181 - Process and plant for the production of urea with high conversion yield and low energy consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UREA CASALE S.A. Via Sorengo, 7 6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | [2001/18] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states UREA CASALE S.A. Via Sorengo, 7 CH-6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagani, Giorgio Viale Faenza 26/6 20142 Milano / IT | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2000/19] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. Via Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [1999/03] | Zardi, Marco, et al c/o Zardi & Partners S.A., Via Pioda 9 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [1998/06] | Bottero, Claudio, et al c/o Porta, Checcacci & Botti S.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96202170.5 | 01.08.1996 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822181 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822181 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C273/04, B01J12/02 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
C07C273/04 (EP);
Y02P20/141 (EP);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IE, IT, LI, NL [2001/18] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, LI | ||
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung von Harnstoff mit hohem Umwandlungsgrad und niedrigem Energieverbrauch | [1998/06] | English: | Process and plant for the production of urea with high conversion yield and low energy consumption | [1998/06] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la fabrication d'urée à rendement de conversion élevé et faible consommation d'énergie | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, FI, GB, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 19.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK | 25.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17] | Request for further processing for: | 22.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.06.2000 | Decision despatched | 22.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 05.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.05.2001 | IT | 02.05.2001 | LI | 02.05.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/18] | CH | 02.05.2001 | |
LI | 02.05.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | CH | 02.05.2001 | |
LI | 02.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0479103 (UREA CASALE SA [CH]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0611753 (UREA CASALE SA [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0624571 (UREA CASALE SA [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | NL6808167 | EP0497215 |