EP0763595 - Detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2001/34] | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1997/12] | For:GB
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vasudevan, Tirucherai Varahan Unilever Res. U.S., Inc., 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | 02 /
Gormley, John Unilever Res. U.S., Inc., 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1997/12] | Zweep, Robert-Jan, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 96202209.1 | 06.08.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | US19950520797 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: US 520797 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763595 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763595 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D11/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
C11D17/0026 (EP,US);
C11D11/0094 (EP,US);
C11D17/0013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/12] | Title | German: | Waschmittelzusammensetzung | [1997/12] | English: | Detergent composition | [1997/12] | French: | Composition détergente | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 11.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
16.10.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Mather, Peter Geoffrey NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
16.10.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Mather, Peter Geoffrey NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
Former [2002/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
16.10.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Mather, Peter Geoffrey Procter & Gamble Services Company NV, 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
Former [2002/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 21.11.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.06.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9112308 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,4-8 * claims 1-3,5,6 *; | [PA]WO9531528 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [PA] 1,4-8 * page 11, line 19 - page 16, line 19 * * page 18, line 13 - line 33 * * claims 1,3,8,9 *; | [A]EP0564250 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 4 * * claims 1,2,8 *; | [DA]EP0160342 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,5-8 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 26 * * claims 1-6 *; | [DA]EP0086614 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]) [DA] 1,4,6-8 * claims 1-28,56-68,80,84 *; | [A]EP0530708 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]) [A] 1,4,6,7 * page 6, line 4 - page 12, line 34 *; | [A]EP0328176 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * claim - *; | [DA]US5147576 (MONTAGUE PETER G [GB], et al) [DA] 1,4,6,7 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9109107 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1,5-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5147576 | WO9109107 | EP0160342 | EP0564250 | WO9108281 | EP0086614 | US4244840 | EP0038101 | EP0104452 | US151884 | EP0079646 | US5312954 | GB1302543 | US19950402675 |