EP0742530 - Mirrorless scanners with movable laser, optical and sensor components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barkan, Edward 8 Lily Drive Setauket, NY 11720 / US | 02 /
Shepard, Howard 18 Provost Avenue Great River, NY 11739 / US | 03 /
Metlitsky, Boris 18 Millstream Lane Stony Brook, NY / US | 04 /
Krichever, Mark 26 Carldon Lane Hauppage, NY 11788 / US | 05 /
Swartz, Jerome 19 Crane Neck Road Old Field, NY 11733 / US | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96202253.9 | 11.05.1989 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | US19880193265 | 11.05.1988 Original published format: US 193265 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0742530 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0742530 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742530 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
G06K7/10891 (EP,US);
G06K7/10564 (EP,US);
G06K7/10584 (EP,US);
G06K7/10633 (EP,US);
G06K7/10653 (EP,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | Spiegelloser Abtaster mit beweglichem Laser, optischen und abfühlenden Bauteilen | [1996/46] | English: | Mirrorless scanners with movable laser, optical and sensor components | [1996/46] | French: | Balayeur optique sans miroir avec laser mobile, optique et capteurs | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89108500.3 / EP0341717 | Divisional application(s) | EP04075162.0 / EP1429278 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXAY]US4409470 (SHEPARD HOWARD M [US], et al) [DX] 34,35 * column 1 - column 6, line 42 * * column 9, line 43 - line 64; figure 1; claims 1-63 * [A] 1-5,7-10,14-28,32,36-38,41 [Y] 39,40; | [YA]DE3220016 (DORNER JOERG DR ING [DE]) [Y] 39,40 * page 5 - page 7; figures 1,2; claims 1-16 * [A] 1,16,19; | [A]US4387297 (SWARTZ JEROME, et al) [A] 1-18,20-28,32-38,41,42 * column 1 - column 5; figure 1; claims 1-46 * * abstract * | Examination | EP0194115 | EP0262943 | EP0264956 | US4578571 |