EP0769749 - Technique for correlating purchasing behavior of a consumer to advertisements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weinblatt, Lee S. 797 Winthrop Road Teaneck New Jersey 07666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states Weinblatt, Lee S. 797 Winthrop Road Teaneck New Jersey 07666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96202292.7 | 27.05.1992 | [1997/17] | Priority number, date | US19910733763 | 22.07.1991 Original published format: US 733763 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0769749 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0769749 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07G1/00 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
G07G1/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0224 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0255 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/17] | Title | German: | Technik zur Korrelation des Kaufverhaltens eines Konsumenten mit Werbeeindrücken | [1997/17] | English: | Technique for correlating purchasing behavior of a consumer to advertisements | [1997/17] | French: | Technique de corrélation du comportement d'achat d'un consommateur avec son exposition à la publicité | [1997/17] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92304775.7 / EP0525947 | Request for further processing for: | 13.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2003 | Decision despatched | 17.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2002 | Decision despatched | 08.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61271569 ; | [A]JPS61131065 ; | [A]JPS61133472 ; | [XY]EP0189691 (COOPERATIVES DE CONSOMMATION S [FR]) [X] 2 * page 3, line 33 - page 7, line 4; figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [Y]EP0253240 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 55; figures 1,3-5 *; | [Y]US4833308 (HUMBLE DAVID R [US]) [Y] 3 * column A * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 7 ** column 3, lines 21-26; figure 1 *; | [A]US4949256 (HUMBLE DAVID R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 5, lines 18-35 * * column 7, line 16 - column 9, line 20; figure 1 *; | [YX] - "MAGNETIC MEDIA RECEIPT FUNCTION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, ARMONK., NY, US, (19900411), vol. 32, no. 11, pages 373 - 374, XP000097743 [Y] 1,3 * the whole document * [X] 2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870423), vol. 11, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 570), & JP61271569 A 19861201 (NIPPON SIGNAL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861105), vol. 10, no. 324, Database accession no. (P - 512), & JP61131065 A 19860618 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861107), vol. 10, no. 327, Database accession no. (P - 513), & JP61133472 A 19860620 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1 * abstract * |