Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0763433
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.07.2004 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
09.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
09.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
24.01.2002 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
18.01.2002 |
Opposition filed |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
11.01.2002 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
02.02.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
13.12.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.08.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.06.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.02.1999 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |
09.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.05.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] |
31.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
27.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
27.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|