EP0763433 - Liquid sorptive coating for ink jet recording media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKWRIGHT INC. 538 Main Street Fiskeville Rhode Island 02823 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states ARKWRIGHT INC. 538 Main Street Fiskeville, Rhode Island 02823 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sargeant, Steven J. 2 Legend Way West Warwick, RI 02893 / US | 02 /
Rundus, Joshua 1 Stoddard Avenue Newport, RI 02840 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Hanneman, Henri W.A.M., et al Océ-Technologies B.V. Patents & Information St. Urbanusweg 43 P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Hanneman, Henri W.A.M., et al Océ-Nederland B.V. Patents and Information St. Urbanusweg 43 P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 96202470.9 | 05.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | US19950527719 | 13.09.1995 Original published format: US 527719 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0763433 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0763433 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763433 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
B41M5/5281 (EP,US);
B41M5/529 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1997/12] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsorptionsfähige Beschichtung für Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1997/12] | English: | Liquid sorptive coating for ink jet recording media | [1997/12] | French: | Couche absorbante des liquides pour matériaux d'enregistrement par jet d'encre | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
24.01.2002
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Matthews, Heather Clare Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB Opponent's representative Matthews, Heather Clare Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | 29.01.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.03.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0286427 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,11-15 * page 3, line 1 - line 26 * * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 11 * * page 7, line 1 - line 8 * * example 1; claims 1-3,8,11 *; | [Y]JPS61193879 ; | [Y]JPS61287782 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870121), vol. 11, no. 21, Database accession no. (M - 555)<2468>, & JP61193879 A 19860828 (TEIJIN LIMITED) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870521), vol. 11, no. 157, Database accession no. (M - 590)<2604>, & JP61287782 A 19861218 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LIMITED) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * |