EP0803511 - Allergenic proteins from ragweed and uses therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | |||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Heska Corporation 3760 Rocky Mountain Avenue Loveland, CO 80538 / US | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | |||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states IMMULOGIC PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION One Kendall Square, Building 600 Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rogers, Bruce 64 Oxford Street No.4 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
Klapper, David G. 501 Sharon Road Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 03 /
Rafner, Thorunn Bolinwood Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 04 /
Kuo, Mei-Chang 1380 Oak Creek Drive 206, Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/16] |
Former [1997/44] | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96202477.4 | 09.03.1990 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | US19890325365 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: US 325365 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803511 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/68 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C07K16/16 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/44] | Title | German: | Allergene Proteine aus Ambrosia und Verwendung davon | [1997/44] | English: | Allergenic proteins from ragweed and uses therefor | [1997/44] | French: | Protéines allergènes tirées de l'ambrosie et utilisations de ces protéines | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 25.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/48] | 12.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 06.02.2009 | Appeal received No. T1272/09 | 21.04.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.09.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant deemed not to be filed | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90905020.5 / EP0463059 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |