EP0767277 - Trench profiling device and profiling cutter thereby applied [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. DEPANNAGEDIENST VAN BOXEL Kraaistraat 2a 2560 Nijlen / BE | [2000/35] |
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states Santermans, René Mettestraat 4 3511 Hasselt / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santermans, René Mettestraat 4 3511 Kuringen-Hasselt / BE | [2000/35] |
Former [1997/15] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 96202679.5 | 25.09.1996 | [1997/15] | Priority number, date | BE19950000821 | 04.10.1995 Original published format: BE 9500821 | [1997/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767277 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767277 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E02F5/28, E01H1/00 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
E01H1/003 (EP);
E02F3/188 (EP);
E02F3/20 (EP);
E02F5/282 (EP);
E02F5/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1997/15] | Title | German: | Grabenprofilierungs-Vorrichtung und Profilierfräse dafür | [1997/15] | English: | Trench profiling device and profiling cutter thereby applied | [1997/15] | French: | Dispositif pour le profilage de tranchéeset sa fraise | [1997/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2660337 (KULINICZ KARL ;RIPAUX FILS SARL ENTR LOUIS (FR)) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 2 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 7,11; | [YA]FR1122392 (R. LEYMARIE) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 8,11; | [A]FR2690471 (HARDY LOUIS) [A] 1-3,6,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]NL7714038 (HERMAN AUGUST MARIA WAAMELINK) [A] 1-4,10,11 * the whole document * |