EP0765924 - Azeotropic compositions of perfluoroethane and nitrous oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/14] | Azeotropic compositions of perfluoroethane and trifluoromethane, or oxide or nitrous oxide, or carbon dioxide, or fluoromethane | ||
[2001/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiflett, Mark Brandon 609 5th Street Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
Yokozeki, Akimichi 109c Congressional Drive Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | 03 /
Minor, Barbara Haviland 233 Green Haven Drive Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96202837.9 | 28.06.1993 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | US19920911938 | 10.07.1992 Original published format: US 911938 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0765924 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0765924 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765924 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C09K3/30, C11D7/50 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
C23G5/02803 (EP);
C08J9/127 (EP);
C08J9/143 (EP);
C08J9/149 (EP);
C09K3/30 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP);
C11D7/02 (EP);
C11D7/505 (EP);
C11D7/5086 (EP);
C11D7/5095 (EP);
C08J2203/12 (EP);
C08J2203/142 (EP);
C08J2207/04 (EP);
C09K2205/106 (EP);
C09K2205/128 (EP);
C09K2205/132 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP);
C11D7/28 (EP);
C11D7/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/14] | Title | German: | Azeotropische Zusammensetzungen auf Basis von Perfluorethan und Distickstoffmonoxid | [2001/17] | English: | Azeotropic compositions of perfluoroethane and nitrous oxide | [2001/17] | French: | Compositions azéotropes de perfluoréthane et d'oxyde azote | [2001/17] |
Former [1997/14] | Azeotropische Zusammensetzungen auf Basis von Perfluorethan und Trifluorethan, oder Distickstoffmonoxoid, oder Kohlendioxid, oder Fluormethan | ||
Former [1997/14] | Azeotropic compositions of perfluoroethane and trifluoromethane, or oxide or nitrous oxide, or carbon dioxide, or fluoromethane | ||
Former [1997/14] | Compositions azéotropes de perfluoroéthane et de trifluorométhane, ou d'oxyde, d'oxyde azote, de dioxyde de carbone ou de fluorométhane | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93916698.9 / EP0649453 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.05.2002 | CH | 22.05.2002 | FR | 22.05.2002 | IT | 22.05.2002 | LI | 22.05.2002 | NL | 22.05.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
FR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | BE | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | CH | 22.05.2002 | |
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/16] | CH | 22.05.2002 | |
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 22.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9307232 (DU PONT DE NEMOURS) [XP] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0174027 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [AP]JPH04288451 ; | [A]JPH0375449 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 017, no. 096, Database accession no. (M - 1372), & JP04288451 A 00000000 (NIPPON KENTETSU) [AP] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 015, no. 239, Database accession no. (M - 1126), & JP03075449 A 00000000 (NIPPONDENSO) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |