EP0772056 - System for controlling the charge/discharge cycles of a rechargeable battery and host device including an intelligent battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/19] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS S.A.S. 22, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
ES
GB
IT
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patillon, Jean-Noel, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Gerard, Olivier, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/13] | Lottin, Claudine, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/11] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al International Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/19] | Lottin, Claudine Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96202928.6 | 21.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | FR19950012864 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: FR 9512864 | [1997/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772056 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772056 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
G01R31/367 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/19] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem für von Lade-/Entladezyklen einer wiederaufladbaren Batterie und zugehörige Vorrichtung mit einer intelligenten Batterie | [1997/19] | English: | System for controlling the charge/discharge cycles of a rechargeable battery and host device including an intelligent battery | [1997/19] | French: | Système de contrôle des cycles de charge-décharge d'une batterie rechargeable, et dispositif hôte muni d'une batterie intelligente | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.08.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/23] | ES | 29.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9013823 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0420530 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-14 * column A *; | [A]EP0505333 (ENEA ENTE NUOVE TEC [IT]) [A] 1-14 * column A *; | [DA] - M. STOLL, "Neural networks - a proper approach to the energy management problem?", TENTH E.C. PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE. PROC. OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, LISBON, PORTUGAL, 8-12 APRIL 1991, pages 427 - 430, XP000577575 [DA] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Dynamic Rechargeable Battery End-Of-Life Prediction", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (198606), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 352 - 356, XP002008839 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |