EP0785692 - Paging system for multi-network terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [2008/17] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levelt, Willem Gerard, c/o KPN Research St. Paulusstraat 4 2264 XZ Leidschendam / NL | 02 /
Lensink, André, c/o KPN Research M.Treublaan 13 2313 VG Leiden / NL | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. BOX 95321 2509 CH The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1999/12] | Klein, Bart Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1999/02] | Beitsma, Gerhard Romano KPN, P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1997/30] | Beitsma, Gerhard Romano Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V., P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96203014.4 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | NL19951001561 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: NL 1001561 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785692 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785692 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785692 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, // H04Q7/38 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP);
H04L12/5692 (EP);
H04W28/18 (EP);
H04W68/00 (EP);
H04W68/025 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [1997/30] | H04Q7/08, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | Rufsystem für Mehrnetz-Endgeräte | [1997/30] | English: | Paging system for multi-network terminals | [1997/30] | French: | Système de messagerie pour terminaux de réseaux multiples | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 08.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08005395.2 / EP1940121 | EP08005396.0 / EP1940122 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 29.10.2008 | [2010/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4642758 (TENG ALBERT Y [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 27 ** column A *; | [A]WO9101615 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 5 * * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]GB2283154 (OUEST STANDARD TELEMATIQUE SA [FR]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 5 * |