EP0759412 - Flat glass furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILKINGTON UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states PILKINGTON UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quirk, Richard 27 Sefton Gardens, Town Green Aughton, Ormskirk, Lancashire, L39 6RY / GB | 02 /
Shulver, Ian Nigel William 32 Curzon Road Southport, Merseyside, PR8 6PL / GB | 03 /
Bird, David Alan 51 Highlands Avenue, Rufford Near Ormskirk, Lancashire, L40 1TE / GB | 04 /
McIntosh, Robin Maxwell 7 Doe Meadow Newburgh, Parbold, WN8 7LM / GB | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96203099.5 | 18.11.1993 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | GB19920024852 | 27.11.1992 Original published format: GB 9224852 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0759412 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0759412 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759412 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/235, C03B5/237, C03B5/04 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
C03B5/00 (KR);
B01D53/56 (EP,US);
C03B5/235 (EP,US);
C03B5/237 (EP,US);
F23C6/04 (EP,US);
F23L15/02 (EP,US);
F23C2900/06041 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | Glasschmelzofen für Flachglas | [1997/09] | English: | Flat glass furnaces | [1997/09] | French: | Fours de fusion de verre pour verre plat | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 21.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93309212.4 / EP0599548 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.1999 | CH | 30.06.1999 | ES | 30.06.1999 | GR | 30.06.1999 | IT | 30.06.1999 | LI | 30.06.1999 | NL | 30.06.1999 | SE | 30.06.1999 | DK | 30.09.1999 | PT | 30.09.1999 | IE | 18.11.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
ES | 30.06.1999 | ||
GR | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
NL | 30.06.1999 | ||
SE | 30.06.1999 | ||
DK | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
ES | 30.06.1999 | ||
GR | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
NL | 30.06.1999 | ||
SE | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
MC | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
ES | 30.06.1999 | ||
GR | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
NL | 30.06.1999 | ||
SE | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
ES | 30.06.1999 | ||
GR | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
SE | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
GR | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
SE | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
GR | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
IE | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
CH | 30.06.1999 | ||
LI | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
CH | 05.10.1999 | ||
LI | 05.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 30.06.1999 | |
PT | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 30.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2056040 (TOLEDO ENG CO) [Y] 1,4,7,9* the whole document *; | [Y]US4375235 (TSAI YIH W) [Y] 1,4,7,9 * column W *; | [A]US4375236 (TSAI YIH W) [A] 1-3,7-9 * column W * | by applicant | JPS558361 | US4347072 | US4372770 | US4559100 | US4878830 |