EP0779246 - Precipitating agent for treating effluents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Torggler Chimica SpA Via Verande 1/A 39012 Merano / IT | [1997/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patauner, Luca Via Alle Gemelle 6 38040 Martignano (Trento) / IT | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing. Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96203292.6 | 22.11.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | IT1995BZ00076 | 11.12.1995 Original published format: IT BZ950076 | [1997/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779246 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779246 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/52, C02F1/54 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
C02F1/52 (EP);
C02F1/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/25] | Extension states | SI | 22.11.1996 | Title | German: | Fällungshilfsmittel zur Behandlung von Abwässern | [1997/25] | English: | Precipitating agent for treating effluents | [1997/25] | French: | Agent de précipitation pour le traitement d'effluents | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 17.03.1999 | DK | 17.06.1999 | PT | 17.06.1999 | IE | 19.10.1999 | LU | 22.11.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/46] | GR | 17.03.1999 | |
DK | 17.06.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 17.03.1999 | |
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 17.03.1999 | |
IE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | IE | 17.03.1999 | |
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | PT | 17.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB610988 (JOHN ERIC EDWARDS, et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 15 - line 72 *; | [A]GB805526 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0513352 (SAKURADA YASUSUKI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 4 * |