EP0779125 - A focusing head of a laser beam provided with a focusing lens for a machine for working metal and non-metal parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SALVAGNINI ITALIA S.p.A. Via Monticello di Fara, 42 I-36040 Sarego (Vicenza) / IT | [1997/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosca, Claudio Via Alberé, 24 38050 Tenna, Trento / IT | 02 /
Perini, Stefano Via Chini, 63 38100 Trento / IT | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Marchi, Massimo, Dr., et al Marchi & Partners, Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/25] | Marchi, Massimo, Dr., et al c/o Marchi & Partners s.r.l., Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96203452.6 | 07.12.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI02621 | 14.12.1995 Original published format: IT MI952621 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779125 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779125 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/02, G02B7/04 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
B23K26/02 (EP,US);
B23K26/035 (EP,US);
G02B7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/25] | Title | German: | Ein mit einer fokussierenden Linse versehener Kopf zur Fokussierung eines Laserstrahls für die Bearbeitung von Metall- und nicht-Metallwerkstücken | [1997/25] | English: | A focusing head of a laser beam provided with a focusing lens for a machine for working metal and non-metal parts | [1997/25] | French: | Tête à focalisation d'un faisceau laser pourvue d'une lentille focalisante pour une machine à traitement des pièces métalliques et non-métalliques | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2000 | GR | 05.04.2000 | DK | 05.07.2000 | PT | 05.07.2000 | IE | 07.12.2000 | LU | 07.12.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
GR | 05.04.2000 | ||
DK | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 07.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
DK | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 07.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 07.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 05.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5924595 ; | [A]FR2532215 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 20 - page 24; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US4979180 (MUNCHERYAN ARTHUR M [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840530), vol. 8, no. 116, Database accession no. (M - 299)<1553>, & JP59024595 A 19840208 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) [A] 1 * abstract * |