blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0768025

EP0768025 - Tailings return system for combine harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/16]Improved tailings return system for combine harvester
[1999/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V.
Leon Claeysstraat 3a
B-8210 Zedelgem / BE
[1997/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Strubbe, Gilbert J.I.
Loppemsestraat 58 B
8210 Loppem / BE
02 / Cromheecke, Eric L. A.
Pauwhoflaan 23
8450 Bredene / BE
03 / Clarisse, Jasper
Rijselsestraat 54
8210 Loppem / BE
04 / Strong, Russell W.
R.R. 1, Box 932
Craftsbury Commons, Vermont / US
[1997/16]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [1997/16]Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date96203570.502.07.1992
[1997/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0768025
Date:16.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0768025
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.1997
ClassificationIPC:A01F12/52
[1997/16]
CPC:
A01F12/52 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/16]
TitleGerman:Spreurückführeinrichtung für Mähdrescher[1997/16]
English:Tailings return system for combine harvester[1999/15]
French:Dispositif de renvoi de résidus pour moissonneuse-batteuse[1997/16]
Former [1997/16]Improved tailings return system for combine harvester
Examination procedure26.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/48]
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.1999Fee for grant paid
14.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92202004.5  / EP0576737
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]GB2051541  (SPERRY NV) [DA] 1,6,7,9 * page 4, line 55 - line 128 * * page 5, line 120 - page 6, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0091538  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]EP0282736  (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, paragraph 1; figure 5 *;
 [A]US3092116  (STROBURG CLARK E, et al) [A] 9,10 * column 2, line 53 - line 68 *;
 [A]DE1199536  (FREUDENDAHL JENS AXEL);
 [A]DE1245199  (MASSEY FERGUSON LTD);
 [DA]DE2037446  (CLAYSON);
 [A]GB2022381  (KUBOTA LTD)
by applicantDE2037446
 GB1136202
 GB2051541
 GB2051541
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.