EP0727875 - Capacitive touch sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynapro Systems, Inc. 800 Carleton Court, Annacis Island New Westminster British Columbia V3M 6L3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states Dynapro Systems, Inc. 800 Carleton Court, Annacis Island New Westminster, British Columbia V3M 6L3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redmayne, Derek V. 5757 Timbervalley Road Delta British Columbia V4L 2H8 / CA | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96250005.4 | 15.01.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | US19950375592 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: US 375592 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727875 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727875 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/96 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H03K17/9622 (EP,US);
G06F3/0443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Berührungssensor | [1996/34] | English: | Capacitive touch sensor | [1996/34] | French: | Capteur à effleurement capacitif | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99250051.2 / EP0917291 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3439337 (TI GROUP SERVICES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 9, line 30 - page 11, line 8 * * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 21 * * page 17, line 7 - line 16 * * figures 3,8 *; | [AX]EP0609021 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 11; figures 3-5 * [X] 11,13,16 |