Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0748971
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.02.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
12.02.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] |
12.02.1999 |
Change - inventor |
published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] |
12.02.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] |
17.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.08.1998 |
First examination report |
|
27.08.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.08.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] |
11.04.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] |
04.04.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] |
01.11.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |