blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0748971

EP0748971 - Method and device for removing, without excavation, lead and plastic pipes laid in the ground [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2000
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.03.2000 [2000/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berliner Wasserbetriebe Anstalt d. öffentlichen Rechts
Hohenzollerndamm 45
10713 Berlin-Wilmersdorf / DE
[1996/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Gaebelein, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing.
Niklasstr. 53
14163 Berlin / DE
02 / Wilinski, Erich, Dr.-Ing.
Köpenicker Str. 108
10179 Berlin / DE
[1999/13]
Former [1996/51]01 / Gaebelein, Wilhelm; Dr.-Ing.
Niklasstr. 53
14163 Berlin / DE
02 / Wilinski, Erich; Dr.-Ing.
Köpenicker Str. 108
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date96250114.422.05.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateDE199512257916.06.1995         Original published format: DE 19522579
[1996/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0748971
Date:18.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0748971
Date:28.05.1997
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0748971
Date:31.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.1997
ClassificationIPC:F16L1/028, F16L55/165, E21B7/26
[1997/21]
CPC:
E03F3/06 (EP); E21B7/30 (EP); F16L55/1658 (EP);
E03F2003/065 (EP)
Former IPC [1996/51]F16L1/028, F16L55/165
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/51]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum grabenlosen Entfernen und Auswechseln erdverlegter Blei- und Kunststoffrohre[1999/13]
English:Method and device for removing, without excavation, lead and plastic pipes laid in the ground[1996/51]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour enlever, sans excavation, des tuyaux en plastique ou en plomp poses dans le sol[1996/51]
Former [1996/51]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum grabenlosen Entfernen und Auswechseln erdverlegter Blei-und Kunststoffrohre
Examination procedure05.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
01.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.1998Fee for grant paid
03.11.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3832214  (R. BUECHL) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0411278  (TRACTO TECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 9, lines 10-35; figures 8-11 *;
 [X]DE3942934  (MUELLER HANS [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH680776  (MINDER SCHWEISS SERVICE) [A] 1-3* the whole document *;
 [X]DE4308654  (GEISS DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.