EP0744172 - Photochromic dental material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2001/17] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states IVOCLAR AG Postfach, Bendererstrasse 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salz, Ulrich, Dr. Gstäudweg 55 88131 Lindau / DE | 02 /
Burtscher, Peter, Dr. Madlenerweg 18 d 6830 Rankweil / AT | 03 /
Rheinberger, Volker, Dr. Mareestr. 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | 04 /
Dürr, Heinz, Prof. Dr. Im Aehrenfeld 2 66121 Saarbrücken / DE | [2003/01] |
Former [1996/48] | 01 /
Salz, Ulrich, Dr. Gstädweg 55 88131 Lindau / DE | ||
02 /
Burtscher, Peter, Dr. Hinteroferst 1 6714 Nütziders / AT | |||
03 /
Rheinberger, Volker, Dr. Mareestr. 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | |||
04 /
Dürr, Heinz, Prof. Dr. Im Aehrenfeld 2 66121 Saarbrücken / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96250116.9 | 24.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | DE1995120016 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19520016 | [1996/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0744172 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0744172 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744172 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/02, A61K6/083 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
A61K6/66 (EP,US);
A61K6/76 (EP,US);
A61K6/77 (EP,US);
A61K6/802 (EP,US);
A61K6/833 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61K6/889 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | Photochromer Dentalwerkstoff | [1996/48] | English: | Photochromic dental material | [1996/48] | French: | Composition dentaire photochromique | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3036103 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) [YD] 1,5 * page 8; table . *; | [AD]US4600389 (SCHWARTZ ABRAHAM [US]); | [D]GB2190917 (G C DENTAL IND CORP); | [A]DE3717762 (G C DENTAL IND CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 17 - line 27 * * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 51 - line 69 * * example - *; | [A]EP0486775 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]) [A] * page 4, line 33 - line 42 *; | [D]US5162130 (MCLAUGHLIN GERALD G [US]); | [A]WO9317632 (MCLAUGHLIN GERALD G [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * example -; claim - *; | [XY] - KOKUBO, TADASHI, "Formation of crystalline fine particles from amorphous solid phase and its application", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19901112), vol. 113, no. 20, Database accession no. 176669, XP002112725 [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * [Y] 1,5 |