EP0737783 - A casing for use in excavation of a borehole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CHARLES MACHINE WORKS INC 1959 West Fir Avenue Perry Oklahoma 73077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states THE CHARLES MACHINE WORKS INC 1959 West Fir Avenue Perry, Oklahoma 73077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuermann, Kenneth W. Skyline Drive, Rt. 2 Perry, Oklahoma 73077 / US | 02 /
Deken, Arthur D. 705 Ivanhoe Perry, Oklahoma 73077 / US | 03 /
Franklin, James E. 816 Locust Perry, OK 73077 / US | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96250119.3 | 22.01.1992 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | US19910646150 | 25.01.1991 Original published format: US 646150 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737783 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737783 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/92, E21B7/18, E21B7/20, E21B21/12, E21B21/00 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
E02F3/925 (EP,US);
E02F3/9206 (EP,US);
E02F3/9256 (EP,US);
E02F5/003 (EP,US);
E21B21/12 (EP,US);
E21B7/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/42] | E02F3/92, E21B7/18, E21B7/20, E21B21/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1996/42] | Title | German: | Bohrröhre | [1996/42] | English: | A casing for use in excavation of a borehole | [1996/42] | French: | Tige de forage | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH | 06.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/23] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 05.06.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 05.06.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 05.06.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR860918 (CIE DES MINES D ANZIN) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 48 - line 60 * * figure .; claim C *; | [Y]US2738163 (SHIELDS DARVIN D) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 35 - line 43 ** figure . *; | [Y]EP0251660 (BRIGGS TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure - * |