EP0722124 - Multilayered photoreceptor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Normandin, Sharon E. 4650 County Line Road Macedon, NY 14502 / US | 02 /
Sullivan, Donald P. 20 Chadwick Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 03 /
Willnow, Alfred H. 42 Rome Lane Ontario, NY 14619 / US | 04 /
Carmichael, Kathleen M. 5689 Pease Road Williamson, NY 14589 / US | 05 /
Thomsen, Karl V. 2116 Kenyon Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | 06 /
Bergfjord, John A. 494 Tanner Lane Macedon, NY 14502 / US | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | Pike, Christopher Gerard Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1996/29] | Johnson, Reginald George Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300064.1 | 03.01.1996 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | US19950368117 | 03.01.1995 Original published format: US 368117 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722124 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722124 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/10, G03G5/14, G03G5/047, G03G5/06 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
G03G5/0659 (EP,US);
G03G5/102 (EP,US);
G03G5/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiger Fotorezeptor | [1996/29] | English: | Multilayered photoreceptor | [1996/29] | French: | Photorécepteur multicouche | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0615164 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 11 - page 16; examples II-V *; | [A]EP0585668 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 7 - page 8; example 1 *; | [A]EP0585675 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 20 - page 10, line 39 *; | [A]GB2258737 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 12; example 1 *; | [A]US5283144 (WARD ANTHONY T [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 21 - column 9, line 38 * |