EP0723130 - Melt heating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yap, Loo T. 80 Nassau Street Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Gough, Peter The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Gough, Peter The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300093.0 | 04.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | US19950376278 | 23.01.1995 Original published format: US 376278 | US19950394866 | 27.02.1995 Original published format: US 394866 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723130 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F27B3/20, C22B21/00, F23D14/22 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
C03B5/2353 (EP,US);
F27B21/00 (KR);
F27B3/205 (EP,US);
Y02P40/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erwärmen einer Schmelze | [1996/30] | English: | Melt heating method | [1996/30] | French: | Procédé pour chauffer une masse fondue | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 24.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/40] | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2136547 (MEICHUSEIKI KABUSHIKIKAISHA) [A] 1* figures 3,5; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0335728 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 6B; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0481835 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5299929 (YAP LOO T [US]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-9; claim 1 * |