EP0720923 - A wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLEXELLO LIMITED Bath Road Slough, Bucks SL1 4ED / GB | [1996/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walker, Phillip S. Park View, Wexham Park Lane, Wexham Slough, Berks SL3 6LX / GB | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300131.8 | 08.01.1996 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | GB19950000233 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: GB 9500233 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0720923 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0720923 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60C7/10 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
B60B5/02 (EP,US);
B60B2310/204 (EP);
B60B2360/102 (EP);
B60B2360/32 (EP);
B60B2360/36 (EP);
B60B2900/313 (EP);
B60B33/00 (EP);
B60B33/0039 (EP);
B60B33/0049 (EP);
B60B33/0057 (EP);
B60B33/0068 (EP);
B60B33/0073 (EP);
B60B9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/28] | Title | German: | Rad | [1996/28] | English: | A wheel | [1996/28] | French: | Roue | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 26.02.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/12] | 21.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1123704 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [XD] 1,3 * figure .; claim - *; | [X]DE2851492 (BERGOUGNAN BENELUX) [X] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE2755111 (LAFLOER LOTHAR) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4164251 (CHUNG DANIEL A [US]) [A] 1,4* claim -; table 1 *; | [XD]GB2035229 (PEMCO KALAMAZOO) [XD] 1-3,6 * page 2, line 10 - line 61; figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE2909718 (POMMEREIT KURT) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE3711038 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim - * |