EP0721273 - Quick dialing in personal mobile phone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiilikainen, Ilkka Pyykkiojankatu 2 B 14 FIN-33710 Tampere / FI | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Nordin, Leif Göran, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Nordin, Leif Göran, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1996/28] | Potter, Julian Mark Nokia Mobile Phones, Patent Department, St. Georges Court, St. Georges Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300148.2 | 09.01.1996 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | FI19950000096 | 09.01.1995 Original published format: FI 950096 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0721273 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0721273 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721273 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/274, H04M1/00, G06F3/033 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
H04M1/27475 (EP,US);
H04M1/2747 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/28] | H04M1/274 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | Kurzwahlverfahren für ein persönliches Mobiltelefon | [1996/28] | English: | Quick dialing in personal mobile phone | [1996/28] | French: | Numérotation abrégée pour un téléphone mobile personnel | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.03.2004 | [2004/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4653086 (LAUBE MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1,7,9 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5335276 (THOMPSON E EARLE [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * column 3, lines 7-14 * * column 14, lines 28-39; figure 2 * * column 21, line 20 - column 22, line 12; figure 8 *; | [A]GB2276520 (US WEST ADVANCED TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A] - "ON-LINE DESKTOP ADDRESS BOOK AND AUTO-DIALER", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19920701), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 439 - 441, XP000313349 [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |