Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3179327B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2001 | B2 | JPH08248156 | 27.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9502350 | 07.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0726508 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2002 | B1 | EP0726508 | 14.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9502350 | 07.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69620496T | 19.12.2002 | T2 | DE69620496D1 | 16.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9502350 | 07.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2297854 | 07.04.1999 | B | GB2297854 | 14.08.1996 | A | GB9502350D0 | 29.03.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9502350 | 07.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5740129 | 14.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9502350 | 07.02.1995 |