EP0724242 - Improvements in or relating to cash registers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tellermate PLC Leeway House, Leeway Industrial Estate Newport, Gwent NP19 4SL / GB | [2006/39] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Tellermate PLC Leeway House, Leeway Industrial Estate Newport, Gwent NP9 0SL, England / GB | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states PERCELL GROUP LIMITED Leeway House, Leeway Industrial Estate Newport, Gwent NP9 0SL, England / GB | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Tellermate Cashroom Systems Limited Leeway House, Leeway Industrial Estate Newport, Gwent NP9 0SL, England / GB | ||
For all designated states CASH BASES GB LIMITED Unit'D', Ranalah Estate, New Road Newhaven, East Sussex BN9 0EH / GB | |||
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states PERCELL GROUP LIMITED Leeway House, Leeway Industrial Estate Newport, Gwent NP9 0SL, England / GB | ||
For all designated states CASH BASES GB LIMITED Unit'D', Ranalah Estate, New Road Newhaven, East Sussex BN9 0EH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biss, Edgar L. Pilstone House, Llandogo Monmouth, Gwent NP25 4TH / GB | [2006/09] |
Former [1996/31] | 01 /
Biss, Edgar L. Pilstone House, Llandogo Monmouth, Gwent NP5 4TS / GB | Representative(s) | Keltie, David Arthur, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Keltie, David Arthur, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2001/38] | Keltie, David Arthur, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AG / GB | ||
Former [1996/31] | Needle, Jacqueline W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300521.0 | 25.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | GB19950001535 | 26.01.1995 Original published format: GB 9501535 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0724242 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0724242 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724242 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, G01G19/42 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
G01G19/42 (EP,US);
G07G1/0027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | G07G1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/31] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an und bezüglich Registrierkassen | [1996/31] | English: | Improvements in or relating to cash registers | [1996/31] | French: | Améliorations aux et concernant les caisses enregistreuses | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2006 | Decision despatched | 03.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2001 | 31.01.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2002 | 31.01.2005 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | DE | 28.12.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | IT | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DE | 28.12.2006 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/06] | IT | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DE | 28.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 27.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4495627 (NISHIMURA KATSUJI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [X]US4522275 (ANDERSON NORMAN L [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * column W *; | [X]FR2586840 (LEROY GERARD [FR]) [X] 1,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0281106 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,6,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]GB2269088 (THOMAS FINDLAY LIMITED [GB], et al) |