blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0725440

EP0725440 - Silicon carbide metal diffusion barrier layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/32]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Loboda, Mark Jon
1902 Vine Street
Midland, Michigan / US
02 / Michael, Keith Winton
2715 Siebert
Midland, Michigan / US
[1996/32]
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Kyle, Diana, et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [1996/38]Lewin, John Harvey, et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [1996/32]Lewin, John Harvey, et al
ELKINGTON AND FIFE Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent, TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date96300522.825.01.1996
[1996/32]
Priority number, dateUS1995038270102.02.1995         Original published format: US 382701
[1996/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0725440
Date:07.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0725440
Date:29.01.1997
[1997/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0725440
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1996
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/532
[1996/32]
CPC:
H01L23/5329 (EP,US); H01L21/31 (KR); H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/32]
TitleGerman:Siliziumcarbid-Metall-Diffusionsbarriere-Schicht[1996/32]
English:Silicon carbide metal diffusion barrier layer[1996/32]
French:Couche barrière contre la diffusion de métaux de carbure de silicium[1996/32]
Examination procedure21.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/17]
19.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.05.2000Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2000Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2004Fee for grant paid
03.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination24.07.2000Appeal received No.  T1117/00
09.10.2000Statement of grounds filed
23.09.2003Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
10.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
09.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS63150963  ;
 [A]EP0285445  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [A] 1-5,7-10 * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 42; figures 1A-1D,2 *;
 [DA]US5103285  (FURUMURA YUJI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0613178  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 14 - line 31 * * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 21; figure 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881031), vol. 012, no. 412, Database accession no. (E - 676), & JP63150963 A 19880623 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
Examination   - VMIC Conference, June 7-8, 1994, pages 414-420
    - Chang C.Y. et al: J. Electochemical Soc., Vol. 132, No. 2 (1985) pages 418-422
    - Anderson D.A.; Spear W.E.: Philosophical Magazine, vol. 35, (1976) pages 1-16
    - Nishino S. et al: J. Applied Physics vol 45(1974) pages 1075-1084
    - Mogab C.J.; Leamy H.L.: J Applied Physics vol. 45 (1974) pp. 1075-1084 with C2H2".
    - Ceramic Materials for Electronics, ed. Relva C. Buchanan, published by Marcel Dekker Inc. New York (1986) pp. 426-427
    - Hawley's Condensed Chemical Dictionary, Eleventh Edition, Van Nostrand Reinhold Company, New York, (1987) pp. 685 and 1039
    - Encyclopaedia of Chemical technology, fourth ed. J Wiley & Sons , New York (1982) pp. 891-911
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.