EP0723845 - Extrusion product with decorative enhancement and process of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marley Mouldings LLC Highway 11 East, P.O. Box 610 Marion, VA 24354-0610 / US | [2002/03] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states Marley Tile AG Zinggentorstrasse 3 6006 Lucerne / CH | ||
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states MARLEY MOULDINGS INC. Highway 11 East, P.O. Box 610 Marion, Va 24354-0610 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cope, Carroll W. 103 Robin Hood Drive Marion, VA 24354 / US | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1996/31] | Watkins, Arnold Jack European Patent Attorney Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300562.4 | 26.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | US19950377175 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: US 377175 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723845 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723845 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723845 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/22, A47G1/06, B29C44/56, B29C44/50 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B29C44/50 (EP,US);
B29C48/0012 (EP,KR,US);
A47G1/0616 (EP,KR,US);
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C44/22 (EP,KR,US);
B29C44/5627 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/002 (KR);
B29C48/12 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/043 (EP,KR,US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
E04F19/04 (KR);
B29C2795/005 (KR);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/904 (EP,US);
B29C48/906 (EP,US);
B29C48/908 (EP,US);
B29C48/9135 (EP,US);
B29C48/916 (EP,US);
B29K2025/06 (KR);
B29K2027/06 (KR);
B29K2105/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/043 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0072 (EP,US);
B29L2012/00 (KR);
B29L2031/003 (EP,US);
B29L2031/776 (KR);
E04F2019/0454 (KR);
Y10T428/24198 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24496 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24694 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24983 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249988 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249989 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31696 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | B29C44/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/31] | Extension states | LT | 12.02.1996 | LV | 12.02.1996 | SI | 12.02.1996 | Title | German: | Extrudierter Gegenstand mit dekorativer Verbesserung und Verfahren. | [1999/09] | English: | Extrusion product with decorative enhancement and process of making the same | [1996/31] | French: | Produit extrudé avec amélioration décorative et procédé | [1996/31] |
Former [1996/31] | Extrudierter Gegenstand mit dekorative Verbesserung und Verfahren | Examination procedure | 18.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.2002 | BE | 10.04.2002 | CH | 10.04.2002 | FR | 10.04.2002 | GR | 10.04.2002 | LI | 10.04.2002 | PT | 10.07.2002 | SE | 10.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | CH | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | CH | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | CH | 10.04.2002 | |
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 10.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06155542 ; | [DA]US3764642 (BOUTILLIER P) [DA] 1,5,12; | [X]US3900544 (JOHNSON KEITH G, et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,14-18 * column 3, line 26 - line 31; figure - * * column 2 *; | [A]DE3640345 (DOELLKEN & CO GMBH W [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940905), vol. 018, no. 474, Database accession no. (M - 1668), & JP06155542 A 19940603 (TOKAI KOGYO KK) [A] 1,15 * abstract * |