EP0787705 - Alkylation with a fluidized solid catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Scott Yu-Feng 1177 Westward Trail Carol Stream, Illinois 60188-4638 / US | 02 /
Gosling, Christopher D. 1611 South Roslyn Street Roselle, Illinois 60172 / US | 03 /
Sechrist, Paul A. 281 Cornell Street Des Plaines, Illinois 60016 / US | 04 /
Funk, Gregory A. 898 Chatham Drive Carol Stream, Illinois 60188 / US | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300755.4 | 02.02.1996 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787705 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787705 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/54 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
C07C2/54 (EP);
Y02P20/584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | Alkylierungsverfahren, in dem ein fluidisierter fester Katalysator verwendet wird | [1997/32] | English: | Alkylation with a fluidized solid catalyst | [1997/32] | French: | Procédé d'alkylation mettant en oeuvre un catalyseur solide fluidisé | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 30.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0680941 (INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [AD]US5157196 (CROSSLAND ET AL) |