EP0761867 - Functional fibre products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/11] | Functional fibre products and process for producing same | ||
[2002/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEIREN CO., LTD. 10-1, Keya 1-chome Fukui-shi Fukui-ken 918-8560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states SEIREN CO., LTD. 10-1, Keya 1-chome Fukui-shi, Fukui-ken 918-8560 / JP | ||
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states SEIREN CO., LTD. 10-1, Keya 1-chome Fukui-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nogata, Akihiro 4-1, Chosenji-cho 1-chome Sabae-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | 02 /
Nomura, Masakazu 7-22, Minami 1-chome Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Hideyuki 212, Watari-cho Fukui-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | [2003/05] |
Former [1997/11] | 01 /
Nogota, Akihiro 4-1, Chosenji-cho 1-chome Sabae-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Nomura, Masakazu 7-22, Minami 1-chome Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Yamada, Hideyuki 212, Watari-cho Fukui-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1997/11] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300908.9 | 09.02.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | JP19950215101 | 21.07.1995 Original published format: JP 21510195 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761867 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761867 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761867 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/15, D06M15/03, D06M13/342 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/027 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61K8/85 (EP,US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
D06M15/03 (EP,US);
D06M15/15 (EP,US);
D06M16/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2927 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2965 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2967 (EP,US);
Y10T442/20 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2311 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2541 (EP,US);
Y10T442/277 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | D06M15/15, D06M13/342 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Funktionelle Faserprodukte | [2002/27] | English: | Functional fibre products | [2002/27] | French: | Produits fibreux fonctionnels | [2002/27] |
Former [1997/11] | Funktionelle Faserprodukte und Verfahren zur Produktion derselben | ||
Former [1997/11] | Functional fibre products and process for producing same | ||
Former [1997/11] | Produits fibreux fonctionnels et procédé pour leur préparation | Examination procedure | 08.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02026858.7 / EP1308553 | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | BE | 02.05.2003 | CH | 02.05.2003 | LI | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE16110 (HOSEMANN, H. R. P.) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH04176460 ; | [X]DE7275 (HOSEMANN, H. R. P.) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10416 (MAGNIER, P ET AL.) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [EA]JPH0860547 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 32, Database accession no. 92-262127, XP002049094 & JPH04176460 A 19920624 (TANAKA Y) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [EA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 19, Database accession no. 96-185467, XP002049095 & JPH0860547 A 19960305 (SEIREN CO LTD) [E] 1-4,7 * abstract * [A] 8,9 |