EP0727870 - Power converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Shinji, c/o Int. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300989.9 | 13.02.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | JP19950025613 | 14.02.1995 Original published format: JP 2561395 | JP19950162572 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: JP 16257295 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0727870 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0727870 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727870 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H02M7/487 (EP);
H02M7/4811 (EP);
H02M1/0095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | Leistungswandler | [1996/34] | English: | Power converter | [1996/34] | French: | Convertisseur de puissance | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Request for further processing for: | 24.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4218662 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,11,14 * figures 3,14,15 *; | [A]US5047913 (DE DONCKER RIK W A A [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - YI W ET AL, "NOVEL SNUBBERLESS THREE-LEVEL GTO INVERTER WITH DUAL QUASI-RESONANT DC-LINK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE (PESC), SEATTLE, JUNE 20 - 25, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930620), no. CONF. 24, pages 880 - 884, XP000399530 [A] 1,5,6,11,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1993.472025 |