blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0729077

EP0729077 - Printing and mailboxing system with sensing when bins are almost full [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sanchez, Hector J.
1078 Sharon Court
Webster, NY 14580 / US
02 / Serio, John P.
103 Guygrace Lane
Webster, NY 14580 / US
03 / Tomory, Ronald S.
332 Little John Way
Webster, NY 14580 / US
[1996/35]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1996/35]Goode, Ian Roy
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date96301086.316.02.1996
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateUS1995039360423.02.1995         Original published format: US 393604
[1996/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0729077
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0729077
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0729077
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G03G15/00
[1996/35]
CPC:
G03G15/6538 (EP,US); B65H39/11 (EP,US); B65H2408/111 (EP,US);
B65H2511/15 (EP,US); G03G2215/00907 (EP,US); G03G2215/00911 (EP,US)
C-Set:
B65H2511/15, B65H2220/01 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Druck- und Briefkastensystem mit Detektieren von Ablagen die beinahe voll sind[1996/35]
English:Printing and mailboxing system with sensing when bins are almost full[1996/35]
French:Système à impression et à boîte aux lettres avec détection de récepteurs de copies presque pleins[1996/35]
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
15.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2005Fee for grant paid
12.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS563254  ;
 [A]US4830358  (FAZIO DOMINICK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 26 - line 47 *;
 [A]US5033731  (LOONEY JOHN H [US]) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [AD]US5328169  (MANDEL BARRY P [US]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 7 * * column 29, line 18 - line 41 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810328), vol. 005, no. 047, Database accession no. (M - 061), & JP56003254 A 19810114 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.