Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0729078
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.07.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
11.08.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
15.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
20.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.08.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
09.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.12.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
10.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] |
11.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.07.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] |