Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08245050 | Global Dossier | 24.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US39360595 | 23.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0729078 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2006 | B1 | EP0729078 | 26.01.2000 | A3 | EP0729078 | 28.08.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39360595 | 23.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9600720 | 18.11.2008 | B1 | BR9600720 | 30.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US39360595 | 23.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2170076 | 03.08.1999 | C | CA2170076 | 24.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39360595 | 23.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69636532T | 21.12.2006 | T2 | DE69636532D1 | 26.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US39360595 | 23.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5547178 | 20.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US39360595 | 23.02.1995 |