EP0729078 - Printer and mailboxing system with banner sheet indicator system for split jobs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/37] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costello, Mark 257 Beresford Road Rochester, NY 14610 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/35] | Goode, Ian Roy Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301087.1 | 16.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | US19950393605 | 23.02.1995 Original published format: US 393605 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0729078 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0729078 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729078 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G03G15/6538 (EP,US);
B42C1/10 (EP,US);
B65H2511/15 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00894 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00907 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00911 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/15, B65H2220/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/35] | Title | German: | Drucker und Briefkastensystem mit einem Anzeigesystem für geteilte Aufträge welches Deckblätter verwendet | [1996/35] | English: | Printer and mailboxing system with banner sheet indicator system for split jobs | [1996/35] | French: | Imprimante et système de boîte aux lettres muni d'un système d'indication de demande d'impression morcelée utilisant des feuilles de couverture | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61112166 ; | [Y]US4211483 (HANNIGAN NOREEN A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 13, line 1 - line 20 *; | [YD]US5328169 (MANDEL BARRY P [US]) [YD] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 18 * * column 30, line 26 - line 54 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861007), vol. 010, no. 294, Database accession no. (P - 504), & JP61112166 A 19860530 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |