EP0733510 - Automotive cup holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA INC. 2444 Koppy Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states TAKATA INC. 2444 Koppy Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieczorek, Joseph P. 28459 Edward Madison Heights, Michigan 080295 / US | 02 /
Brunckhorst, Collin C. 15 North Northside Drive Lake Orion, Michigan 48362 / US | 03 /
Davenport, Mark H. 45773 Brookside North Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US | 04 /
Halajian, Eugene M. 39200 Venetian Harrison Township, Michigan 48045 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301185.3 | 22.02.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | US19950394392 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: US 394392 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0733510 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0733510 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733510 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60N3/10, B60N2/46 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
B60N3/102 (EP,US);
B60N2/793 (EP,US);
A47C7/70 (US);
B60N3/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/39] | B60N3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | Becherträger für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1996/39] | English: | Automotive cup holder | [1996/39] | French: | Porte-gobelet pour véhicule automobile | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.12.2002 | NL | 11.12.2002 | IE | 24.02.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/04] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
IE | 24.02.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4981277 (ELWELL JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-19 * column W *; | [A]US5284314 (MISARAS DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0438858 (LEAR SEATING CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]US5102085 (WIECZOREK JOSEPH P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,14 * column A; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]EP0443726 (LEAR SEATING CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * |