EP0732210 - Method of ink suction in ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jae-han 209-2 Maetan 4-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301187.9 | 22.02.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | KR19950005257 | 14.03.1995 Original published format: KR 9505257 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732210 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732210 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
B41J2/16532 (EP);
B41J2/16585 (KR);
B41J2/16579 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/38] | Title | German: | Tintenabsaugungsverfahren für einen Tintenstrahldrucker | [1996/38] | English: | Method of ink suction in ink jet printer | [1996/38] | French: | Méthode d'aspiration d'encre pour une imprimante à jet d'encre | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0592006 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5; | [A]US5389961 (TAKAGI SEIICHI [JP]) [A] 1,2,5; | [A]US5386222 (IWATA KAZUYA [JP]) [A] 1,5,6; | [AD]US5296876 (YAMAGUCHI SHUICHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1,5 |