Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0732600
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
19.09.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
27.09.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
29.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.01.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.02.2002 [2002/08] |
11.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.02.2001 |
First examination report |
|
13.02.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.05.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |
26.04.1999 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.01.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] |
26.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |
07.08.1998 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
19.06.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
19.06.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
26.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |