Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2869033B | Global Dossier | 10.03.1999 | B2 | JPH08297170 | 12.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US40569095 | 17.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0732600 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2002 | B1 | EP0732600 | 05.08.1998 | A3 | EP0732600 | 18.09.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US40569095 | 17.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69624739T | 02.10.2003 | T2 | DE69624739D1 | 19.12.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US40569095 | 17.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5525907 | 11.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US40569095 | 17.03.1995 |