EP0730907 - Transfer port system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renzi, Ernesto 417 Riverview Drive Youngstown, New York 14174 / US | 02 /
Krikhaar, Johannes Willibrorduslaan No. 50B 5521 KD Eersel / NL | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Bousfield, Roger James The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Bousfield, Roger James The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301569.8 | 07.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | US19950401390 | 09.03.1995 Original published format: US 401390 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730907 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730907 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730907 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01L1/02, B25J21/02 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
F26B5/06 (EP,US);
B01L1/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/37] | B01L1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | System zum Überführen von Gegenständen durch eine Öffnung | [2001/34] | English: | Transfer port system | [1996/37] | French: | Système de transfert à travers une ouverture | [1996/37] |
Former [1996/37] | System zum Überführen von Gegenstanden durch eine Öffnung | Examination procedure | 23.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1146767 (SNYDER MFG COMPANY INC) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 40; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0450700 (CLEAN AIR TECHNIEK [NL]) [A] 3,4 * column 5, line 26 - line 43; figure .; claim 11 *; | [A]US5313738 (THAKUR BHABESH K [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 6, line 12 - line 25; figure 6 *; | [A]US5314668 (BIERMAIER STEPHAN [DE]) [A] 1,2* column 6, line 33 - line 66 *; | [PX]EP0662373 (CAPITAL FORMATION INC [US]) [PX] 1 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 30; figures 1.V-1.IX * * column 6, line 23 - line 55; figure 8; claims 6,13 * |