EP0732342 - Method for purifying polysaccharide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU BIO, Inc. 6650 Lusk Boulevard, Suite B-102 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIN-ETSU BIO, Inc. 6650 Lusk Boulevard, Suite B-102 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruyama, Kazumasa 11-2 Kasugano 1-chome Joetsu-shi, Nogata 943 / JP | 02 /
Nagura, Shigehiro 1635 Shimoyoshi-shinden, Kubiki-mura Nakakubiki-gun, Nigata 942-01 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Kazuyuki 2-3-11 Kokufu Joetsu-shi, Nigata 942 / JP | 04 /
Homma, Taira E-306 Sanai-cho Joetsu-shi, Nigata 943 / JP | [1996/42] |
Former [1996/38] | 01 /
Maruyama, Kazumasa 14-45-12 Gochi 2-chome Joetsu-shi, Nigata 942 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagura, Shigehiro 1635 Shimoyoshi-shinden, Kubiki-mura Nakakubiki-gun, Nigata 942-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamamoto, Kazuyuki 2-3-11 Kokufu Joetsu-shi, Nigata 942 / JP | |||
04 /
Homma, Taira 18-32 Kobari 5-chome Nigata-shi, Nigata 950-21 / JP | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Bassett, Richard Simon ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301742.1 | 14.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | US19950403450 | 14.03.1995 Original published format: US 403450 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732342 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732342 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
C08B37/0003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Polysaccharid | [1996/38] | English: | Method for purifying polysaccharide | [1996/38] | French: | Méthode de purification de polysaccharide | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0514890 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column A; figure 1; example 1 *; | [D]US5315003 (MARUYAMA KAZUMASA [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0375099 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * example 1 * |