EP0732863 - Paging method in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Takafumi, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Kamagata, Eiji, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301792.6 | 15.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | JP19950056362 | 15.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5636295 | JP19950139479 | 06.06.1995 Original published format: JP 13947995 | JP19950259287 | 12.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25928795 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732863 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732863 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732863 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H04W68/06 (EP,US);
H04W68/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/38] | Title | German: | Rufverfahren in einem mobilen Übertragungssystem | [1996/38] | English: | Paging method in a mobile communication system | [1996/38] | French: | Procédé d'appel dans un système de communication mobile | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5309503 (BRUCKERT EUGENE J [US], et al) [A] 11,24,43* column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5369681 (BOUDREAU ALAIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-4,7-14,17-20,42,43 * column 7, line 53 - column 9, line 64; figures 2,3A,3B *; | [A] - PLASSMANN D, "LOCATION MANAGEMENT STRATEGIES FOR MOBILE CELLULAR NETWORKS OF 3RD GENERATION1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, STOCKHOLM, JUNE 8 - 10, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940608), vol. 1, pages 649 - 653, XP000496754 [A] 1-4,7-14,17,19,20,30,42,43 * paragraph [0002] * |