EP0733575 - Bag dispensers and method of dispensing bags therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAVID KENNEDY (ENGINEERS) HOLDINGS LIMITED Brookside Uckfield East Sussex TN22 1YA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states DAVID KENNEDY (ENGINEERS) HOLDINGS LIMITED Brookside Uckfield, East Sussex TN22 1YA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kennedy, James Walter Little Swifts, Spotted Cow Lane Buxton, East Sussex TN22 4QG / GB | 02 /
Macchi Cassia, Antonio 52 Rue Monte Rosa Milan / IT | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301910.4 | 20.03.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | GB19950005643 | 21.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9505643 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0733575 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0733575 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/00, B65D33/00, B65D83/08 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
B65D33/001 (EP,US);
B65D83/0876 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/39] | B65H35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | Ausgabeeinrichtung für Beutel und Verfahren zum Ausgeben von Beuteln daraus | [1996/39] | English: | Bag dispensers and method of dispensing bags therefrom | [1996/39] | French: | Distributeur de sacs et procédé pour distribuer des sacs à partir de celui-ci | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/04] | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1180434 (ERIC CORNER LTD) [A] * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US3624791 (TAUB HERSH) [A] 1,13 * column W *; | [A]US3896966 (CANNO LEONARD E) [A] 1,13 * column W *; | [A]GB2035264 (BIBBY & BARON LTD) [A] 1,2,9,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4805969 (HEACOCK STEPHANIE [CA]) [A] 1-3,9,12-14 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5269423 (NGUYEN TAI [US]) [A] 1,13 * column W *; | [A]GB2269367 (DISPENSE A BAG SYST LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,9,12-14 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB2274098 (ALIDA HOLDINGS PLC [GB]) [X] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,7-12,14 |