EP0735486 - Packet switched cache coherent multiprocessor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue, MS PAL1-521 Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue, MS PAL1-521 Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | ||
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue, MS PAL1-521 Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishtala, Satyanarayana 11522 Country Spring Court Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
Ebrahim, Zahir 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, California 94042 / US | 03 /
Van Loo, William C. 2330 Emerson Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 04 /
Normoyle, Kevin 4708 Borina Drive San Jose, California 95129 / US | 05 /
Kohn, Leslie 43967 Rosemere Drive Fremont, California 94539 / US | 06 /
Coffin, Louis F., III 3444 Wine Cork Way San Jose, California 95124 / US | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302150.6 | 28.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | US19950415175 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: US 415175 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735486 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735486 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
G06F12/0822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | Paketvermitteltes cachekohärentes Multiprozessorsystem | [1996/40] | English: | Packet switched cache coherent multiprocessor system | [1996/40] | French: | Système multiprocesseur à commutation par paquets et à cohérence d'antémémoire | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.06.2003 | IT | 25.06.2003 | NL | 25.06.2003 | SE | 25.09.2003 | DE | 26.09.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 25.06.2003 | |
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
DE | 26.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | NL | 25.06.2003 | |
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
DE | 26.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 25.06.2003 | |
SE | 25.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0380842 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 10, line 5 - page 13, line 5; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0598535 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 55; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0497054 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-10 * page 6, line 39 - page 7, line 19; figures 1A,3 * |