EP0735034 - Process for removal of diol as impurity in cyclic carbonic acid ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toriida, Masahiro c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind., Ltd., 580-32 Aza Taku 2-gou, Nagaura, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Hiwara, Akio c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind., Ltd., 580-32 Aza Taku 2-gou, Nagaura, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Yokoyama, Keiichi c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind., Ltd., 580-32 Aza Taku 2-gou, Nagaura, Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302303.1 | 01.04.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | JP19950076259 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: JP 7625995 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735034 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735034 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/36, C07D317/38, C07D319/06 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
C07D319/06 (EP,US);
C07C69/96 (KR);
C07D317/36 (EP,US);
C07D317/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Diol als Verunreinigung in zyklischen Carbonsäureestern | [1999/27] | English: | Process for removal of diol as impurity in cyclic carbonic acid ester | [1996/40] | French: | Procédé d'élimination de diol comme impureté dans l'ester cyclique de l'acide carbonique | [1996/40] |
Former [1996/40] | Verfahren zur Enfernung von Diol als Verunreinigung in zyklischen Carbonsäureestern | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3846450 (STALKER G, et al) [A] 1-10 * column W * | [A] - J. F. COETZEE, Recommended Methods on Purification of Solvents and Tests for Impurities, OXFORD UK, PERGAMON PRESS, (1982), XP000576836 [A] 1-10 * page 19 - page 24 * | Examination | EP0614240 | by applicant | JPH0574485 |