EP0740367 - A connector with a cap-type retainer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/44] | A connector with a cap-type retainer | ||
[1998/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maegawa, Akihito, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Nobuyoshi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Sys., Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | 03 /
Saka, Yukinori, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Sys., Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | 04 /
Ichida, Kiyofumi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Sys., Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302325.4 | 02.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19950128992 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: JP 12899295 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740367 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740367 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/436 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
H01R13/4364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | Verbinder mit kappenartigem Rückhalteelement | [1998/18] | English: | A connector with a cap-type retainer | [1998/41] | French: | Connecteur ayant un support à couvercle | [1996/44] |
Former [1996/44] | Verbinder mit hülsenähnlichen Haltebügel | ||
Former [1996/44] | A connector with a cap-type retainer | Examination procedure | 10.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4410950 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 40 - line 56 * * column 4, line 36 - line 61; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0374492 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 30 - line 41 * * column 5, line 11 - line 26; figures 1,4A-4D * |