EP0736402 - Air conditioner for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP | ||
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Katsumi, c/o Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372 / JP | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1996/41] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302346.0 | 02.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | JP19950081360 | 06.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8136095 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736402 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736402 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736402 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
B60H1/00314 (EP,US);
B60H1/00907 (EP,US);
B60H1/039 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00935 (EP,US);
F25B2313/004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/41] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugklimaanlage | [1996/41] | English: | Air conditioner for vehicles | [1996/41] | French: | Dispositif de climatisation pour véhicule | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0356716 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 54; figures 2,4 * [Y] 3-6,9; | [Y]EP0566475 (VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 24 - line 38; figure 6 *; | [Y]FR2621867 (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 4 * page 16, line 20 - page 17, line 5; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5330385 (HOTTA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6,9 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 38; figures 1,29,31 *; | [AD]JPS62181909 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880127), vol. 012, no. 027, Database accession no. (M - 662), & JP62181909 A 19870810 (TOYO RADIATOR KK) [AD] * abstract * |