EP0736666 - Method and apparatus for determining the stress state and material properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serata, Shosei c/o SERATA GEOMECHANICS INC, 4122 Lakeside Drive Richmond California 94806 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states Serata, Shosei c/o SERATA GEOMECHANICS INC, 4122 Lakeside Drive Richmond, California 94806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302374.2 | 03.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | US19950415196 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: US 415196 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736666 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736666 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/00, E21B33/127, E21B43/26 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
E21B33/1277 (EP,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,US);
E21B47/08 (EP,US);
E21B49/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/41] | E21B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von Spannungszuständen und Materialeigenschaften | [1996/41] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining the stress state and material properties | [1996/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination de l'état de tension et des propriétés de matériaux | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 06.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/36] | 06.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4733567 (SERATA SHOSEI [US]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4813278 (KOSUGI MASAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document * |